Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Underpass Cuisine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., McMoore McLesst Publishing, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, MJ Publishing Trust, Welsh Witch Music, New Thunder Music Co., Carnival Music Company, Songs of Universal, Inc. and Pink Dog Publishing
Defendant: Underpass Cuisine, LLC and Chad Hughes
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to File Status Report. Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 is RESET for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file Joint Status Report reset to 4/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/20/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
March 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to File Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to File Status Report by All Plaintiffs. (Balkin, Mark) Modified on 3/18/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/6/2019. (JSL)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chad Hughes, Underpass Cuisine, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, MJ Publishing Trust, McMoore McLesst Publishing, New Thunder Music Co., Pink Dog Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music. (EDC)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Carnival Music Company, MJ Publishing Trust, McMoore McLesst Publishing, New Thunder Music Co., Pink Dog Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc... (Balkin, Mark)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1889400.), filed by McMoore McLesst Publishing, Welsh Witch Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Pink Dog Publishing, MJ Publishing Trust, Carnival Music Company, Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., New Thunder Music Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Balkin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Underpass Cuisine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McMoore McLesst Publishing
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Thunder Music Co.
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Music Company
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pink Dog Publishing
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underpass Cuisine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?