Causey et al v. Murphy Oil USA INC et al

Plaintiff: Rose Lee Causey
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Murphy Oil USA INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00052
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Murphy Oil USA INC.(Delk, Kimberly)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance, good cause is shown to CONTINUE the Scheduling Conference to 6/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rose Lee Causey. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Meredith, Collins) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/1/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/1/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rose Lee Causey. Murphy Oil USA INC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Meredith, Collins) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/1/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/1/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW).
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Murphy Oil USA INC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Meredith, Collins) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/28/2019) (ELW). Modified on 2/28/2019 to correct orientation (ELW).
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Meredith, Collins) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/28/2019) (ELW). Modified on 2/28/2019 to correct orientation (ELW).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/13/2019. (SWE)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #4 Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs Original Complaint filed by all Plaintiffs is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to substitute the [4-1] Amended Complaint in the place of #1 , which shall become the operative complaint of Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiffs' Original Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Complaint)(Meredith, Collins)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE and ORDER: Plaintiff Rose Lee Causey shall file a Motion to Substitute the Complaint with a comprehensive amended Complaint, that contains all of Plaintiffs allegations, as revised, amended, and/or supplemented, that adequately alleges the citizenships of Plaintiffs and Defendants Murphy Oil USA, Inc., d/b/a Murphy Express and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days from this Notice and Order to file the Motion to Substitute as to #1 Complaint filed by Rose Lee Causey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 02/01/2019. (ELW)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Rose Lee Causey (Meredith, Collins) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/31/2019) (ELW). Modified on 1/31/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW).
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 Amended COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1892595.), filed by Rose Lee Causey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Meredith, Collins) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/12/2019) (ELW). Modified on 2/12/2019 as granted by rec doc #5 (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Causey et al v. Murphy Oil USA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA INC
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Lee Causey
Represented By: Mitchell Locke Meredith
Represented By: Curtis Locke Meredith, Jr.
Represented By: Sean Duvall Fagan
Represented By: Collins Locke Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?