Group Contractors, LLC v. Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Plaintiff: Group Contractors, LLC
Defendant: Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Group Contractors, LLC. (Madison, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Group Contractors, LLC by Air Liquide Large Industries US LP.(Garner, James) Modified on 3/25/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air Liquide Large Industries US LP, filed by Group Contractors, LLC.(Madison, John)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 2/26/2019 the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendant Air Liquide Large Industries, U.S., LP, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/12/2019. (SWE)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/11/2019. (JSL)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Air Liquide Large Industries US LP's answer due 3/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Group Contractors, LLC. Air Liquide Large Industries US LP served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Madison, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Air Liquide Large Industries US LP. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Madison, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Liquide Large Industries US LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1895123.), filed by Group Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Madison, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Group Contractors, LLC v. Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Group Contractors, LLC
Represented By: John M. Madison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Liquide Large Industries US LP
Represented By: Alex Edward Hotard
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?