Michaels Stores, Inc. v. Jones
Plaintiff: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Defendant: Tiffany Y. Jones
Case Number: 3:2019cv00090
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Hearne, Heather)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Tiffany Y. Jones.(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Tiffany Y. Jones, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.(Hearne, Heather) Modified on 2/25/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Tiffany Y. Jones.(Wilson, Scott) Modified on 2/25/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 02/19/2019. (NLT)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. Tiffany Y. Jones served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Hearne, Heather)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tiffany Y. Jones. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Application to Confirm Arbitration Award against Michaels Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1899109.), filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hearne, Heather) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/11/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaels Stores, Inc. v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Dawn Hearne
Represented By: Christine S. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Y. Jones
Represented By: Scott D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?