Dermansky v. US Healthcare Journals, LLC
Plaintiff: Julie Dermansky
Defendant: US Healthcare Journals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00091
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendant having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/19/2019. (EDC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to US Healthcare Journals, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Copyright Action by Julie Dermansky (Hair, Galen) Modified on 2/12/2019 form mailed to Copyright office (ELW).
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Healthcare Journals, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1899259.), filed by Julie Dermansky. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Attachment Proposed Summons)(Hair, Galen) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/12/2019) (ELW). Modified on 2/12/2019 to rotate pages (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dermansky v. US Healthcare Journals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Dermansky
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Healthcare Journals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?