Mattear v. THD At-Home Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ka Ronda Mattear
Defendant: THD At-Home Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Bench Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/14/2020. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/5/19. (BKA)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Initial Disclosures due 4/4/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/3/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/15/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 11/15/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 1/16/2020. Motions shall be filed by 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/4/2019. (SGO)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Remand. The Motion has been withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw #6 MOTION to Remand. The Motion to Remand will be considered withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
March 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remand filed by Ka Ronda Mattear. (Roy, Leon) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/29/2019) (EDC). Modified on 3/29/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remand by Ka Ronda Mattear. (Roy, Leon) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/29/2019) (EDC). Modified on 3/29/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Ka Ronda Mattear. (Roy, Leon)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #3 Rule 12(B)(6) MOTION for Dismissal, filed by THD At-Home Services, Inc.. (EDC)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by THD At-Home Services, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/18/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by THD At-Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Dimiss, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Theard, David)
March 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Ka Ronda Mattear. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter, #4 Exhibit Petition)(Chapoton, Douglas) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/12/2019) (ELW). (Attachment 1-4 replaced on 3/12/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/12/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW).
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 Rule 12(B)(6) MOTION for Dismissal filed by Ka Ronda Mattear. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter, #2 Exhibit Petition)(Chapoton, Douglas) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/12/2019) (ELW). (Attachment 1 & 2 replaced on 3/12/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/12/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/28/2019. (JSL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 12(B)(6) MOTION for Dismissal by THD At-Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Theard, David) Modified on 2/19/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney John Dale Powers regarding Leon Roy, IV who is Co-Counsel for party THD At-Home Services, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nineteenth Judicial District Court, Case Number C-678603 27. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1899720), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Citation, Petition and Request for Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Service Return, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Theard, David) Modified on 2/12/2019 to flatten cover sheet (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattear v. THD At-Home Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THD At-Home Services, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Theard
Represented By: Jennifer F. Kogos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ka Ronda Mattear
Represented By: John Dale Powers
Represented By: Douglas M. Chapoton
Represented By: Leon E Roy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?