Carter v. Gautreaux et al
Plaintiff: Walter Carter
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, John and Jane Doe(s) A-Z and East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 3:2019cv00105
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Partial Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, only, are hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice, reserving unto the plaintiff any and all claims against any and all other parties. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/14/2019. (LLH)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walter Carter. Sid J. Gautreaux, III waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Dennis Grimes waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver form)(Whitmore, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Walter Carter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Whitmore, David) Modified on 3/12/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/20/2019. (KAH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dennis Grimes. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sid J. Gautreaux, III. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1901883.), filed by Walter Carter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment Proposed Summons)(Whitmore, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Gautreaux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe(s) A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Carter
Represented By: David C. Whitmore
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?