Chargois v. United Rentals Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Eretrius Chargois
Defendant: United Rentals Inc., John Doe(s) and Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00110
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Eretrius Chargois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Karam, Jacob)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/14/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 2/14/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/16/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 6/15/2020. Motions shall be filed by 8/14/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 12/10/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/29/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 1/27/2021. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 through 2/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 04/16/2019. (ELW)
April 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Cory D. Itkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1928446). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 10:30 AM is CANCELLED. A Scheduling Order shall be issued.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Cory D. Itkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1928446) by Eretrius Chargois. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Cory D. Itkin, #3 Attachment Oath of Cory D. Itkin, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Wexler, Noah)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Any renewed motion to amend the pleadings to name Ace American Insurance Company as a defendant must include a proposed pleading providing the proper citizenship particulars for that entity, and must also again assert whether the motion is opposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/15/2019. (SGO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Eretrius Chargois. (Karam, Jacob)
April 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Non-Suit Without Prejudice by Eretrius Chargois (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Karam, Jacob) Modified on 4/2/2019 to edit the event type (KAH).
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Eretrius Chargois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Karam, Jacob)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Ryan Scott MacLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ryan Scott MacLeod added for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
March 14, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Ryan Scott MacLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 14, 2019 Notice of Payment of $100.00 Pro Hac Vice Fee by Eretrius Chargois. Filing fee $ 100. Receipt No. CLAMDC-1912102. (DCB)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Ryan Scott MacLeod to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eretrius Chargois. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Ryan S. MacLeod, #3 Attachment Oath of Ryan Scott MacLeod, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Wexler, Noah)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (JSL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United Rentals Inc..(Latham, Mark)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Noah Michael Wexler regarding Jacob M. Karam who is Co-Counsel for party Eretrius Chargois. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-678924. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1902717), filed by United Rentals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Latham, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chargois v. United Rentals Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Latham
Represented By: Alexander J Baynham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eretrius Chargois
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Represented By: Ryan Scott MacLeod
Represented By: Jacob Mansour Karam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?