Wheeler v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Petitioner: Tamra Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00112
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (BLR)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Aetnas responsive pleading due May 22, 2019, Attorney FRCP 26(f) conference deadline June 14, 2019, Status Report due June 21, 2019. A scheduling conference is set for July 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, #2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Conrad, Richard) Modified on 4/16/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Kevin Alan Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Kevin Alan Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1915045). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Kevin Alan Rogers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1915045) by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Alan Rogers, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing-Kevin Alan Rogers, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order - Kevin Alan Rogers)(Conrad, Richard)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Roy H. Liddell to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting #5 Motion for Ardith M. Bronson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Ardith M. Bronson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Ardith M. Bronson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1912774) by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration-Ardith M. Bronson, #2 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing-Ardith M. Bronson, #3 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Good Standing-Ardith M. Bronson, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order-Ardith M. Bronson)(Conrad, Richard) Modified on 3/18/2019 to add filing fee information (SWE).
March 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Roy H. Liddell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1912704). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Roy H. Liddell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1912704) by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration-Roy H. Liddell, #2 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing-Roy H. Liddell, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order-Roy H. Liddell)(Conrad, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tamra Wheeler. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Bankston, Larry)
February 21, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/2/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (BLR)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Status Report due by 4/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/21/2019. (BLR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1902887.), filed by Tamra Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bankston, Larry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2019) (EDC). Modified on 2/21/2019 to flatten document. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tamra Wheeler
Represented By: Larry S. Bankston
Represented By: Jenna H. Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Alan Rogers
Represented By: Roy H. Liddell
Represented By: Ardith M. Bronson
Represented By: Richard T. Conrad, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?