Bachman v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: Gregory Bachman
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00113
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 10/26/2020. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/15/19. (BKA)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for April 18, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 5/2/2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 12/2/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 1/15/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 3/2/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/30/2020. The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/12/2019. (JSL)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 Amended STATUS REPORT by Gregory Bachman. (Higgins, Scott)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/8/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Gregory Bachman. (Higgins, Scott)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION to Dismiss Re: FRCP 12 (b) (2) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and 12 (b) (3) Improper Venue by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Chassaignac, Charles)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Re: FRCP 12 (b) (2) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and 12 (b) (3) Improper Venue by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A and B)(Chassaignac, Charles)
February 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines (Court Use Only) (SGO)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/27/2019. (JSL)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS ORDERED that Travelers Property Casualty Company of American is granted an additional twenty (21) days from February 28, 2019 in which to file responsive pleadings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Travelers Property Casualty Company of America file responsive pleadings on or before March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp.,, Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Chassaignac, Charles)
February 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Chassaignac, Charles) Modified on 2/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of List of Parties, Copies of Pleadings and Service Re: 28 USC 1447(b) by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Chassaignac, Charles) Modified on 2/22/2019 to edit text (SGO).
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 678390-D. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1903393), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Chassaignac, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachman v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Eleanor Weeks Wall
Represented By: Justin Murphy DeLaune
Represented By: Kellye Rosenzweig Grinton
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bachman
Represented By: David Charles Laborde, Sr.
Represented By: Derrick G. Earles
Represented By: Scott F. Higgins
Represented By: Jeff David Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?