Jones et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Caleb Jones and Maudrey Jones
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc. and Sam's East, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00124
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Rule 26 filed by Maudrey Jones (Cline, Leonard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 5/23/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The Show Cause Response and Status Report Deadline remain 5/9/2019. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The scheduling conference is RESET for 5/23/2019 at 11:00 a.m. The status report is to be filed no later than 5/9/2019. Plaintiff(s) shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file the status report as directed. If the status report is filed by 5/9/2019, then no response is due from plaintiffs' counsel to this order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/16/2019. (SGO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's West, Inc.. (Beard, Roy)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc.. (Beard, Roy)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc. (Beard, Roy) Modified on 3/11/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (JSL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc..(Beard, Roy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Leonard Joseph Cline, Jr. regarding Robert J. Seghers and David M. Williams who are Co-Counsel for party Caleb Jones and Maudrey Jones. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 6787712. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1904933), filed by Sam's West, Inc., Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Beard, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Jones
Represented By: Leonard Joseph Cline, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maudrey Jones
Represented By: Leonard Joseph Cline, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Roy C. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Roy C. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?