Dean v. Shell Pipeline Company, LP

Plaintiff: Howard L. Dean
Defendant: Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00137
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In view of the Court's order dated 4/9/2019 (R. Doc.7), granting defendant an extension of time until 5/6/2019 to file responsive pleadings, the Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 is RESET for 5/23/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file the Joint Status Report is reset to 5/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 R. Doc. 8 no longer exists. Filed in error. Modified on 4/9/2019 (BLR).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Shell Pipeline Company, LP shall file responsive pleadings by 5/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint by Shell Pipeline Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Huffstetler, Scott)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/18/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/19/2019. (JSL)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard L. Dean. Shell Pipeline Company, LP served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Smith, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 First Amended and Supplemental Complaint against Shell Pipeline Company, LP, filed by Howard L. Dean.(Smith, J.) Modified on 3/8/2019 to edit text.(EDC).
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shell Pipeline Company, LP. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shell Pipeline Company, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1908626.), filed by Howard L. Dean. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 summons requested)(Smith, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Represented By: Scott D. Huffstetler
Represented By: Chelsea Gomez Caswell
Represented By: Kristi Danielle Obafunwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. Dean
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Represented By: Joseph Arthur Smith, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?