Dotson v. PepsiCo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Randal J. Dotson
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00205
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 06/06/2019. (ELW)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/13/2019. Discovery due by 11/8/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/4/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 11/4/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/10/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 2/10/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 3/13/2020. Motions shall be filed by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 06/06/2019. (ELW)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Randal J. Dotson. (Sudduth, James)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Raymond A. Cowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Raymond A. Cowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1935460). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PepsiCo, Inc.. (Gardner, Lauren)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PepsiCo, Inc..(Gardner, Lauren)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Raymond A. Cowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1935460) by PepsiCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Gardner, Lauren)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/11/2019. (KAH)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PepsiCo, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/10/2019) (ELW). Modified on 4/10/2019 to add judge assignment(ELW).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1924592.), filed by Randal J. Dotson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment)(Sudduth, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. PepsiCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal J. Dotson
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Ledet Gardner
Represented By: Raymond A. Cowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?