Fields v. QBE Speciality Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cleo Fields
Defendant: QBE Speciality Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00209
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/8/2021. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/25/19. (BKA) Modified on 6/26/2019 to add routing (KAH).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling COnference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/3/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 4/1/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 5/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 6/1/2020. Motions shall be filed by 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (SGO)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Cleo Fields. (Marcotte, Cristen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute deficient Notice of Removal. The Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1) shall be substituted with the corrected pleading filed at R. Doc. 2-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/17/2019. (SGO)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Roderick Alvendia regarding Amy C. Fontenot who is Co-Counsel for party Cleo Fields. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
April 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute deficient Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QBE Speciality Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Corporation, Corporate Parent QBE Reinsurance Corporation, Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Incorporated, Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Incorporated, Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Limited for QBE Speciality Insurance Company.. (Teske, Christopher)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute deficient Notice of Removal by QBE Speciality Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Order)(Teske, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-670803. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1925440), filed by QBE Speciality Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Teske, Christopher) Modified on 4/22/2019 to substitute pleading per RD 6 (SGO). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/24/2019) (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. QBE Speciality Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Fields
Represented By: John Bartholomew Kelly, III
Represented By: Kurt Offner
Represented By: Cristen Marcotte
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: Jeanne K. Demarest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Teske
Represented By: Leigh Brittany Ackal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?