Downs v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Downs
Defendant: The R.V. Shop, Inc. and Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00213
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #5 Motion to Transfer Case, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The court will review this matter in 120 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELED pending further review of the #6 Status Report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Domingue, Lamont) Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Defendants. (Domingue, Lamont)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana by The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mark D. Stanley, #3 Attachment)(Domingue, Lamont)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc., filed by Stephen M. Downs. (Attachments: #1 proposed Summons-Thor Motor Coach, #2 proposed Summons- The R.V. Shop, Inc.)(Pharis, Fred) Modified on 5/1/2019 to flatten the attachments (KAH).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/12/2019. (KAH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1926390.), filed by Stephen M. Downs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Pharis, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The R.V. Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Downs
Represented By: Fred A. Pharis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?