Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board v. United States Federal Trade Commission
Plaintiff: Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board
Defendant: United State Federal Trade Commision, US attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 3:2019cv00214
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Status Conference by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Greenstein, Seth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss of Federal Trade Commission by United State Federal Trade Commision. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of The Federal Trade Commission's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gaupp, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Greenstein, Seth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (KMW)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment)(Greenstein, Seth) Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Greenstein, Seth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by United State Federal Trade Commision. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Gaupp, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply and to Exceed Page Limit by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit, #4 Attachment)(Greenstein, Seth)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United State Federal Trade Commision. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Exceed the Page Limit, #2 Attachment Proposed Order re Unopposed Motion to Exceed the Page Limit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition of the Federal Trade Commission to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Administrative Proceedings, #4 Attachment Proposed Order Denying Motion to Stay Administrative Proceedings)(Gaupp, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. United State Federal Trade Commision served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019; Attorney General of the United States served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; US attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 proof of service, #2 proof of service)(Edwards, Arlene)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William Stephen Cannon and Seth David Greenstein are hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1933161), #17 MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1933171). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JSL)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Strike 14 Notice of Appearance. The Notice of Appearance (R. Doc 14) shall be STRUCK from the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Strike 11 Notice of Appearance. The Notice of Appearance (R. Doc 11) shall be STRUCK from the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1933171) by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Edwards, Arlene)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1933161) by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 proposed order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Edwards, Arlene)
April 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 14 Notice of (other) Appearance. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 14 Notice of (other) Appearance by United State Federal Trade Commision. (Gaupp, John)
April 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 11 Notice of (other) Appearance. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE of Appearance by United State Federal Trade Commision (Gaupp, John) Modified on 4/29/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 19 (KAH).
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 11 Notice of (other) Appearance by United State Federal Trade Commision. (Gaupp, John)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Incorrect Pleading by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Edwards, Arlene) Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE of Appearance by United State Federal Trade Commision (Gaupp, John) Modified on 4/29/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 18 (KAH).
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #9 Motion to Stay. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (ELW)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay administrative proceedings pending review and for expedited treatment by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;, #5 certificate)(Edwards, Arlene). Added MOTION for expedited Treatment on 4/24/2019 (ELW).
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United State Federal Trade Commision. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 summons)(Edwards, Arlene)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for United States Federal Trade Commission. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (ELW)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Edwards, Arlene)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons. The summons was not filled out. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (SWE)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Statement of Collateral Proceedings and Refiled Cases Pursuant to Loc. R. 3(A) by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board re #1 Complaint (Edwards, Arlene) Modified on 4/12/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Administrative Procedure Act and for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1927035.), filed by Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Edwards, Arlene) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/12/2019 to flatten the document and to edit the text) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board v. United States Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State Federal Trade Commision
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US attorney for the Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Seth David Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?