Stewart v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Everlina Stewart
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00215
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Bench Trial set for 3/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 2/8/2021. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/19. (BKA)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 9/3/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 4/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 5/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 6/1/2020. Motions shall be filed by 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (SGO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Murphy, Peyton)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Document. The Clerk's Office shall file R. Doc. 8-1 in the place of R. Doc. 7. The #9 Motion to Substitute Counsel is GRANTED. John Brady Casey is hereby substituted as lead counsel for defendant United States of America in place of John J. Gaupp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Substitute Counsel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Substitute Document . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Counsel by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gaupp, John) Modified on 6/20/2019 to edit the event and text (SWE).
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Document by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Answer, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gaupp, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America.(Casey, John) Modified on 6/26/2019 to replace as per rec doc 10 (KAH).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Status Report Deadline. The Scheduling Conference previously set for 6/20/2019 is RESET to 7/11/2019 at 4:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. The Status Report deadline is extended to 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Status Conference Deadline . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Status Conference Deadline by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gaupp, John)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General for the United States of America. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Everlina Stewart re #1 Complaint, (Murphy, Peyton)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Stewart, Everlina against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1927054.), filed by Everlina Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Murphy, Peyton) (Attachments 1-3 replaced on 4/12/2019) (EDC). Modified on 4/12/2019 to flatten pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John Brady Casey
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everlina Stewart
Represented By: Peyton Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Ashleigh Nicole Mazerac
Represented By: Candy Fodor Be
Represented By: Troy D. Morain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?