Tortorich v. Expert Auto Sales and Service, LLC
Plaintiff: Frankie Tortorich and Frankie M. Tortorich
Defendant: Expert Auto Sales and Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00222
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendant having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 8/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 8/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER the granting #7 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney Garth J. Ridge is hereby withdraw as counsel of record for plaintiff Frankie M. Tortorich. The #6 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Amended MOTION for Garth J. Ridge to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Garth J. Ridge to Withdraw as Attorney by Frankie M. Tortorich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ridge, Garth)
June 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Garth J. Ridge to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Garth J. Ridge to Withdraw as Attorney by Frankie M. Tortorich. (Ridge, Garth)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Expert Auto Sales and Service, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/16/2019. (ELW)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/16/2019. (ELW)
April 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frankie Tortorich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridge, Garth)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Expert Auto Sales and Service, LLC, filed by Frankie Tortorich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Ridge, Garth) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/16/2019) (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tortorich v. Expert Auto Sales and Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Tortorich
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie M. Tortorich
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expert Auto Sales and Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?