Isaac v. Vannoy et al

Petitioner: Travis Isaac
Respondent: Jeff Landry and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00226
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff has sufficient funds to pay the Court's filing fee. Filing Fee due by 7/5/2019. Plaintiff's #2 Deficient Motion for Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/14/2019. (SWE)
June 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Travis Isaac. (EDC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Documents (Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS. (Attachments: #1 local rule, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(EDC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Filing Fee due by 6/7/2019. Statement of Account due by 6/7/2019. (NLT)
April 23, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
April 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Travis Isaac. (EDC)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Travis Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?