Templeton Ridge Development, LLC v. Chesapeake Operating, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Templeton Ridge Development, LLC
Defendant: JN Exploration & Production, Limited Partnership, Chesapeake Operating, LLC, First Energy Corporation and IP Petroleum, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00227
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Plasma Processing Corporation. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (KAH)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Submitted (Cefalu, Joseph) Modified on 7/5/2019 to flatten the document (KAH).
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #11 Order Administratively Staying this case, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 is CANCELLED. The parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. at (225) 389-3602 once the stay is lifted to reschedule the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/3/2019. (SWE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Administrative Stay by Chesapeake Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Klemm, Kenneth) Modified on 5/31/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Templeton Ridge Development, LLC. (Cefalu, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Chesapeake Operating, LLC.(SWE)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by Chesapeake Operating, LLC. The Amended Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 6-2) shall be filed into the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 UConsent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Chesapeake Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal)(McNamara, Jennifer) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chesapeake Operating, LLC. (McNamara, Jennifer)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IP Petroleum, LLC identifying Corporate Parent International Paper Company for IP Petroleum, LLC.. (Gray, Timothy)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by IP Petroleum, LLC.(Gray, Timothy)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court of Louisiana, Case Number 681027. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1929515), filed by Chesapeake Operating, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(McNamara, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Templeton Ridge Development, LLC v. Chesapeake Operating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Templeton Ridge Development, LLC
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Joseph John Cefalu, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JN Exploration & Production, Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, LLC
Represented By: Robert L Blankenship
Represented By: Jennifer Burrows McNamara
Represented By: Gregory E. Bodin
Represented By: Tessa Maria Pousson-Vorhaben
Represented By: Kenneth M. Klemm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IP Petroleum, LLC
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?