Cortez v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Cortez
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., K&B Louisiana Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00232
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Order Vacating Condition Transfer Order and Vacating the July 25, 2019, Hearing Session by the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (SWE)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Remanding Case to 19th JDC. Certified copy of this order sent to 19th JDC. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/20/2019. (EDC)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULING AND ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand. A separate Order of Remand shall issue. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/20/2019. (EDC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2019 re #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Sandra Cortez. Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. Matter is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of correspondence regarding supplemental authority by Sandra Cortez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cheek, Lindsey)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Luna Barrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Luna Barrington is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Defendants, Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Luna Barrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1956025). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Luna Barrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1956025) by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Luna Barrington, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 9), the Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 is CANCELLED and no Status Report is required to be filed at this time. Upon resolution of the #9 Motion to Remand, the parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. at (225) 389-3602 to reschedule the conference, if necessary. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 Notice to Counsel: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 is RESCHEDULED for 6/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(PJH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand with leave for excess pages previously granted by Court Order (Rec. Doc.12) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- SDNY Court Order, #2 Exhibit 2 -- EDPA Court Order, #3 Exhibit 3 -- May 13 EDNY Court Order, #4 Exhibit 4 -- May 14 EDNY Court Order, #5 Exhibit 5 -- ND Ohio Court Order (Berry case), #6 Exhibit 6 -- ND Ohio Court Order (Reardon case), #7 Exhibit 7 -- D Mass Court Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
May 24, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (EDC)
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines: Any response to #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand are due by 5/31/2019. (EDC)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Sandra Cortez. (EDC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Strike; Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; and #11 Motion for Oral Argument as to #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand. Oral argument on Motion to Remand set for 6/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Any response to Emergency Motion to Remand shall be filed by 5/31/2019. The Emergency Motion to Remand is no longer referred and it is now before the United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/24/2019. (EDC)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limit MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Oral Argument on #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand , Motions Referred by Sandra Cortez. (Cheek, Lindsey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Remand by Sandra Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Cheek, Lindsey). Added MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limit on 5/22/2019 (SWE). Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text(SWE).
May 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Sandra Cortez. (Attachments: # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD (1) Memorandum in Support, # 2 Motion For Leave, # 3 Request for Oral argument, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-2, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 5/24/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 12. (EDC).
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc..(Benach, Carlos)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnson & Johnson's answer due 5/17/2019; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.'s answer due 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Lindsey A. Cheek regarding Bridget B. Truxillo and Rubi L. Brown who are Co-Counsel for party Sandra Cortez. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/22/2019 with flattened document) (SWE).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-676334. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1930159), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Luna Barrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Luna Barrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Cortez
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Jeanne Louise St. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?