Huffman v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Huffman
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., K&B Louisiana Corporation and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00233
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #9 Motion to Remand by Cheryl Huffman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(SWE)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk is directed to file R. Docs. 16-1 through 16-7 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Oral Argument on #9 Emergency Motion to Remand. If the Court determines that oral argument will assist in resolution of the Emergency Motion to Remand, the Court will order oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Cheryl Huffman. (SWE)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Remand and Combined Motion for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limit. The clerk is directed to strike R. Docs. 9-1, 9-2 and 9-5. The clerk is further directed to file R. Doc. 11-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Oral Argument on #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand , Motions Referred , #11 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document MOTION for Leave to. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Oral Argument on #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand , Motions Referred by Cheryl Huffman. (Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 5/23/2019 to edit text (ELW).
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document by Cheryl Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Cheek, Lindsey). Added MOTION for Leave to file excess of the page limit on 5/22/2019 (ELW).
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson.(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit docket text(KMW).
May 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Cheryl Huffman. (Attachments: STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD # 1 Memorandum in Support, STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD # 2 Motion For Leave, #3 Request for Oral argument, #4 Notice of Submission, STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD # 5 Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-2, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 5/28/2019 to remove documents 9-1, 9-2 and 9-5 in accordance with RD 13 (SWE).
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Benach, Carlos)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/25/2019. (KAH)
April 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal with Correct Caption. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 4-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal with Correct Caption in place of Rec. Doc. 1 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal with Correct Caption in place of Rec. Doc. 1 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Damon R. Pourciau regarding Rubi L. Brown who is Co-Counsel for party Cheryl Huffman. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-665105. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1930163), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/24/2019) (ELW). Modified on 4/24/2019 as ordered by rec doc 5 (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Huffman
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Jeanne Louise St. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?