Autin v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Christine Autin
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson and K&B Louisiana Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00234
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 20 Order on Motion for Oral Argument. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Christine Autin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Oral Argument at this time. Should the court later determine that oral argument is necessary, a separate order will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 15 Order on Motion to Continue, 17 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 13 Order on Motion to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (EDC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(KAH)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. R. Doc. 16-1 and attachments shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
June 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaitniff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint MOTION to Stay Status Report Deadline. In light of the pending Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 8), the Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 is CANCELLED and no Status Report is required to be filed at this time. Upon resolution of the #8 Motion to Remand, the parties shall contact chambers at (225) 389-3602 to reschedule the conference, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Joint MOTION to Stay June 6, 2019 Status Report Deadline [Rec. Doc. 5]. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay June 6, 2019 Status Report Deadline [Rec. Doc. 5] by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 6/5/2019 (SGO).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Strike and for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk of Court shall strike R. Docs. 8-2 and 8-5, and shall substitute R. Doc. 11-2 in the place of R. Doc. 8-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Request for Oral Argument on Motions Referred, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Remand and MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limit. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Oral Argument on Motions Referred, #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Christine Autin. (Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Remand by Christine Autin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Cheek, Lindsey). Added MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limit on 5/22/2019 (SWE). Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit docket text (KMW).
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to [8-1] Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (SWE)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Christine Autin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD# 2 Motion For Leave, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission,STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD # 5 Request for Oral Arguments, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit D-2, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Attachment 1 replaced and 8-2 and 8-5 removed on 5/30/2019 in accordance with RD 13) (SWE).
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Johnson & Johnson's answer due 5/21/2019; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KAH)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Damon R. Pourciau regarding Bridget B. Truxillo and Rubi L. Brown who are Co-Counsel for party Christine Autin. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-671445. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1930166), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autin v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan D Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey J Siemann
Represented By: Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Autin
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Jeanne Louise St. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?