Eaton et al v. Brenntag North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Williams Stewart, III, Patricia Eaton and Yvonne Koelzer
Defendant: Yardley & Company Ltd., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Riley-Benton Company, Inc., Coty US Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Whitaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Clinique Laboratories, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Sam Broussard Trucking Co., Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., The Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Avon Products, Inc., Estee Laudes, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson & Johnson, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Parfums de Coeus, Ltd., Sears Roebuck & Co, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Halston Fragrances, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Brenntag North America, Inc. and Coty, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00250
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Joseph Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 Order to Show Cause, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Benach, Carlos)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing and within 7 days, why this action should not be remanded under 28 U.S.C. 1452(b). Show Cause Response in writing due by 6/26/2019. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/19/2019. (ELW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Previously Filed Answer by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Benach, Carlos)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(f), the undersigned Chief Judges of the United States District Courts for the Middle District of Louisiana and the Eastern District of Louisiana hereby concur in and authorize the temporary assignment of United States Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., of the Eastern District to perform the duties designated herein in the Middle District in connection with the captioned case. The duration of Magistrate Judge Wilkinson's temporary assignment will coincide with the duration of the pendency of the captioned matter. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/15/2019. (NLT)
May 2, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Unassigned. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. answer due 5/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/1/2019. (KAH)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera)
April 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,,, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 29, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KAH)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney John Dennis Person regarding Courtney H. Payton who is Co-Counsel for party Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-657132. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1932911), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4 - State Court Record, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5 - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit B - Part 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #7 Exhibit B - Part 2 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #8 Exhibit B - Part 3 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #9 Exhibit B - Part 4 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #10 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Benach, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton et al v. Brenntag North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yardley & Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: John Dennis Person
Represented By: Lezly L. Petrovich
Represented By: Omar K. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley-Benton Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty US Inc.
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: McNeil J. Kemmerly
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinique Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Broussard Trucking Co., Inc.
Represented By: Edward P. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: McNeil J. Kemmerly
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Forrest Ren Wilkes
Represented By: Martin James Dempsey, Jr.
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Represented By: Margaret Adams Casey
Represented By: Jason Kirk Elam
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Ashley Armour Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Emmerling
Represented By: Andrew A. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estee Laudes, Inc.
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph B. Morton, III
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: John Dennis Person
Represented By: Lezly L. Petrovich
Represented By: Omar K. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Erin Conner Percy
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: Katie Dampier Chabert
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parfums de Coeus, Ltd.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Donna Mannina Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck & Co
Represented By: Rocky Wayne Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: John T. Balhoff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Petrochemical Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Etienne Francis Rene
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Gray
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halston Fragrances, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier DeBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Represented By: McNeil J. Kemmerly
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Quentin F. Urquhart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Stewart, III
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Eaton
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Koelzer
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?