Clay v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stacia Russell Clay
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00263
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending Motion to Remand, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is RESET for 8/22/2019 at 3:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. An Amended Joint Status Report shall be filed by 8/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The Clerk shall substitute R. Doc. 12-1 in the place of R. Doc. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
June 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Remand)(Chassaignac, Charles)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chassaignac, Charles) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/19/2019) (ELW). Modified on 6/19/2019 replaced as ordered by rec doc 13 (ELW).
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Stacia Russell Clay. (Gheith, Farah)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Strike 6 MOTION to Remand. R. Doc. 6 shall be struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
May 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Strike 6 Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike 6 Motion to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
May 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 6 MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Petition)(Gheith, Farah) Modified on 5/30/2019 to remove document as it has been stricken in accordance with RD 9 (SWE).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Chassaignac, Charles)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chassaignac, Charles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Parties, Copies of Pleadings and Service in Compliance with 28 USC Section 1447 (b) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-681008. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1934890), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Demand, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Chassaignac, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Represented By: Eleanor Weeks Wall
Represented By: Justin Murphy DeLaune
Represented By: Kellye Rosenzweig Grinton
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacia Russell Clay
Represented By: Farah F. Gheith
Represented By: Spencer H. Calahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?