Sorey v. Cenikor Foundation
Plaintiff: Gregory Sorey, Marlon Woods, Ashley Rogers, Adam Ross Johnson, Esteban Collins, David Dupuis, Samuel Wayne Cutrer, Chris Mendow, John London, Stuart Baye, Jeremiah J. Harrison, Ginamarie Samudio-Penick, Austen Brown, Suzanne Babin, Charles Evan, Beau Lirette, Ronnie Williams, Mattie Daniels, Dustin Carroll, Jay Arthur Prejean, Alester Williams and Katrina White
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00267
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 45 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Notice Regarding Potential Mootness of Motions in Light of Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to First to File Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(DeReus, Garret)
June 27, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
June 27, 2019 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to First-to-File Court by Gregory Sorey and by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Knapp, Bradley)
June 27, 2019 Filing 42 Joint Initial STATUS REPORT by Defendant and by All Plaintiffs. (DeReus, Garret) Modified on 6/28/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney. Zachary C. Flowerree is hereby designated as lead counsel for plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Consolidate Case with 3:19-cv-00268; and 3:19-cv-00294 and Appointment of Lead Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Flowerree, #3 Exhibit 2 - Werman, #4 Exhibit 3 - DeReus, #5 Attachment Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret)
June 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION Designate Lead Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeReus, Garret)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The Civil Action Nos. 19-cv-267, 19-cv-268 and 19-cv-294 are set for a Status Conference on 7/1/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/19/2019. (EDC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion to Designate Lead Attorney. Attorney David M. Gregory shall be designated as lead counsel for defendant Cenikor Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #33 Unopposed MOTION to Designate Lead Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cenikor Foundation. (Gregory, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 34 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cenikor Foundation.(Gregory, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Designate Lead Attorney by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gregory, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
June 3, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (DCB)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court notes the above captioned matters all include Fair Labor Standards Act claims by similarly situated Plaintiffs who attended Defendant's residential rehabilitation facility. Considering Local Rule 3(b), all civil matters, which involve subject matter that comprises all or a material part of the subject matter or cooperative facts of another action, shall be transferred to the section with the lowest docket number. Civil Case Number 3:19-00268-JWD-RLB is transferred from Judge John W. deGravelles to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Further, Civil Case Number 3:19-00294-SDD-RLB is transferred from Judge Shelly D. Dick to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Further, the #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer Motion in Civil Case Number 3:19-00267-BAJ-RLB is GRANTED and Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion is extended through 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/31/2019. (SWE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION re #12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Cenikor Foundation. (Knapp, Bradley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's #27 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #12 MOTION for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Gregory Sorey. (DeReus, Garret) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #12 MOTION for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Pre-Answer #12 MOTION for Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Motion for David Gregory to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Andrew Reed, to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Gregory, Christopher Dove, Andrew Reed and Frank Sommerville are hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for Defendant Cenikor Foundation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Ex Parte Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Cenikor Foundation is granted a 21-day extension of time until and including 6/18/2019 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 Ex Parte MOTION for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946688), #23 Ex Parte MOTION for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946650). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION for Frank Sommerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946688) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 Ex Parte MOTION for Andrew Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946650) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (SGO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Ex Parte MOTION for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945811). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #19 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel David Gregory to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Ex Parte MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION for Christopher Dove to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945811) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 Ex Parte MOTION to Permit Out of State Counsel David Gregory to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1945804) by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Complaint, by Cenikor Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knapp, Bradley) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Gregory Sorey (DeReus, Garret)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westermeier, Emily)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Sorey. Cenikor Foundation served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Attorney Emily Anne Westermeier added as co-counsel for Plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Step-One Notice Under the Fair Labor Standards Act by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(DeReus, Garret)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Emily A. Westermeier as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Emily A. Westermeier as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bizer, Andrew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Douglas M. Werman and Zachary C. Flowerree are hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff Gregory Sorey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO)
May 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936867). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936835). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Zachary C. Flowerree to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936867) by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(DeReus, Garret)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Douglas M. Werman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1936835) by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration and Certificate of Good Standing)(DeReus, Garret)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cenikor Foundation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of of Filing Consent by Gregory Sorey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeReus, Garret)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cenikor Foundation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1935621.), filed by Gregory Sorey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Executed Consent Form)(DeReus, Garret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorey v. Cenikor Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sorey
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Woods
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Rogers
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ross Johnson
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Collins
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dupuis
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Wayne Cutrer
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mendow
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John London
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Baye
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah J. Harrison
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginamarie Samudio-Penick
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austen Brown
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Babin
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Evan
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Lirette
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Williams
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Daniels
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Carroll
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Arthur Prejean
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alester Williams
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina White
Represented By: Garret Scott DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Represented By: Zachary Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Emily Anne Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenikor Foundation
Represented By: David Gregory
Represented By: Joel Paul Babineaux
Represented By: Andrew W. Reed
Represented By: Karen Bordelon
Represented By: Bradley Clay Knapp
Represented By: Chris Dove
Represented By: Frank Sommerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?