Johnson v. Louisiana State Prison Angola Medical Department

Plaintiff: Rickey Johnson
Defendant: Louisiana State Prison Angola Medical Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00275
Filed: May 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT : The proceeding is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure of the Plaintiff to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/27/2019. (ELW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 RULING : A review of the record by the Court reflects that, despite notice. Plaintiff has failed to respond to the Court's directives. As such, Plaintiff's action shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/27/2019. (ELW)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2019. Filing Fee due by 5/28/2019. Statement of Account due by 5/28/2019. (SWE)
May 5, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
May 5, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Motion for a Emergency Preliminary Injunction by Rickey Johnson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) For the image,see record document 1. (EDC)
May 5, 2019 Filing 1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Motion for a Emergency Preliminary Injnction against Louisiana State Prison Angola Medical Department, filed by Rickey Johnson.(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Louisiana State Prison Angola Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Prison Angola Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?