Didier Consultants, Inc. v. Sasol Chemicals (USA), L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Didier Consultants, Inc.
Defendant: Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) LLC and Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00284
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion to Amend Scheduling Conference Order. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 is reset for 8/22/2019 at 4:00 p.m. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Conference Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Conference Order by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Robinson, J.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, J.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Pleading; SUMMONS)(Robinson, J.)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendant Sasol (USA)Corporation, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Robinson, J.)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sasol (USA) Corporation, Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1938668.), filed by Didier Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons)(Robinson, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Didier Consultants, Inc. v. Sasol Chemicals (USA), L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol (USA) Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol Chemicals (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasol Chemicals (USA) L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Didier Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?