Sanderford v. Walmart Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Terry Sanderford
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00292
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to Removal by Terry Sanderford (Stephens, Willie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Amount in Controversy filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Hardy, Sidney)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: as to #1 Notice of Removal, on or before May 27, 2019, Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc. shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. Section 1332 is met. On or before June 6, 2019, Plaintiff Terry Sanderford shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Wal-Mart has established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. Section 1332, or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately estblished. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/20/2019. (EDC)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Answer and Jury Demand by Walmart Inc.. (Hardy, Sidney) Modified on 5/15/2019 to edit title (KMW).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2019. (KAH)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 681802. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1940020), filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hardy, Sidney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderford v. Walmart Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Sanderford
Represented By: Willie L. Stephens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Sidney J. Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?