Joseph, et al v. Broussard, et al

Plaintiff: BRYAN K JOSEPH, Karla Joseph and Bryan K. Joseph
Defendant: PAUL BROUSSARD, TRIMAC TRANSPORTATION INC., Great West Casualty Co., Trimac Transportation, Inc., Great West Casualty and Trimac Transportation Central, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00296
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Paul Broussard, Great West Casualty, Trimac Transportation Central, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons, #2 Attachment Summons)(Doyle, James) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/4/2019 to flatten the document) (KMW). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2019) (KMW). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/4/2019) (KMW).
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bryan K. Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover sheet)(Doyle, James) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten document Modified on 5/21/2019 (LT).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: By no later than 5/27/2019, Plaintiffs Bryan and Karla Joseph shall file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, that includes all of Plaintiffs numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, that properly sets forth the citizenship particulars required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/20/2019. (KAH)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Substitute Document. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 3-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Original Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Paul Broussard, Great West Casualty, and Trimac Transportation, Inc. The summons were not completely filled out. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (SWE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Original Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Substitute original complaint, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons, #5 Attachment Summons)(Doyle, James)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2019. (KAH)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Broussard, Trimac Transportation, and Great West Casualty ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1940384.), filed by Bryan K. Joseph.(Doyle, James) Modified on 5/10/2019 to edit the text(SWE). Modified on 5/16/2019 to replace as per rec doc 4 (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph, et al v. Broussard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL BROUSSARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIMAC TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimac Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimac Transportation Central, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN K JOSEPH
Represented By: James B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Joseph
Represented By: James B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan K. Joseph
Represented By: James B. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?