Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. Coastal Bridge Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Defendant: Coastal Bridge Company, Inc. and Coastal Bridge Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00298
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #11 Amended Complaint, and #7 Amended Complaint by Coastal Bridge Company, Inc., Coastal Bridge Company, LLC.(Hicks, Michael) Modified on 6/26/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OPEN ACCOUNT AND BREACH OF CONTRACT against Coastal Bridge Company, Inc., Coastal Bridge Company, LLC, filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Johnson, Edward)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendants Coastal Bridge Company, Inc. and Coastal Bridge Company, LLC are granted an extension of 21 days, or until 6/26/2019, to respond to plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 6/13/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of Coastal Investment Holdings, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/6/2019. (KAH)
June 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Hicks, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OPEN ACCOUNT AND BREACH OF CONTRACT against Coastal Bridge Company, Inc., Coastal Bridge Company, LLC, filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Johnson, Edward)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/30/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of defendants Coastal Bridge Company, LLC and Coastal Bridge Company, Inc., by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (SGO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. Coastal Bridge Company, Inc. served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019; Coastal Bridge Company, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Johnson, Edward)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/14/2019. (SGO)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coastal Bridge Company, Inc., Coastal Bridge Company, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Johnson, Edward)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Open Account and Breach of Contract against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1940814.), filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. Coastal Bridge Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Bridge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Bridge Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Edward S. Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Lawrence Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?