Epic Piping LLC et al v. Epic Specialty Companies, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Epic Piping LLC and United WELD Holdings, LP
Defendant: Epic Refractory LLC, Epic Specialty Companies, LLC, Epic Specialty Towers LLC, Epic Precision Services LLC, Epic Specialty I&E LLC, Epic Specialty Mechanical LLC and Epic Specialty Welding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00303
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting #20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/19/2019. (SWE) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/19/2019) (SWE).
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Agreed Order of Dismissal With Prejudice)(Zimmerman, Richard)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 06/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Epic Piping LLC, United WELD Holdings, LP (Zimmerman, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of ABBREVIATED Briefing Schedule on #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) : Opposition to the motion shall be filed by June 19, 2019, and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief no later than June 26, 2019, and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Epic Precision Services LLC, Epic Refractory LLC, Epic Specialty Companies, LLC, Epic Specialty I&E LLC, Epic Specialty Mechanical LLC, Epic Specialty Towers LLC, Epic Specialty Welding, LLC.(Whitfield, Marc)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Whitfield, Marc)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 and #13 Motions for Christopher Mark Weimer and Andrea K. Shannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Andrea Kaye Shannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1949962). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Christopher Mark Weimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1949954). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Andrea Kaye Shannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1949962) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Declaration of Andrea Shannon, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Murrill, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Christopher Mark Weimer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1949954) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Declaration of Christopher Weimer, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Murrill, John)
May 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019- 7/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. (LLH)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. parties shall abide by deadlines set hereweithin the order. The hearing on the Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction shall be held on Thursday and Friday set for 7/25/2019 through 7/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 05/29/2019. (ELW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 8/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION Motion to Enter Scheduling Order by Epic Piping LLC, United WELD Holdings, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Scheduling Order)(Zimmerman, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/20/2019. (KAH)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: Status Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 9:00 AM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Counsel for Epic Piping LLC is responsible for notifying opposing counsel of the date and time of this conference. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Epic Piping LLC, United WELD Holdings, LP. Epic Precision Services LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; Epic Refractory LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; Epic Specialty I&E LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; Epic Specialty Mechanical LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; Epic Specialty Towers LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; Epic Specialty Welding, LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Fernandez, Keith)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Epic Piping LLC, United WELD Holdings, LP. Epic Specialty Companies, LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Fernandez, Keith)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Epic Precision Services LLC, Epic Refractory LLC, Epic Specialty Companies, LLC, Epic Specialty I&E LLC, Epic Specialty Mechanical LLC, Epic Specialty Towers LLC, Epic Specialty Welding, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (KAH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Zimmerman, Richard) Modified on 5/14/2019 to rotate attachment (KAH). Modified on 5/15/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1941492.), filed by Epic Piping LLC, United WELD Holdings, LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Attachment Summonses for All Defendants)(Zimmerman, Richard) Modified on 5/14/2019 to rotate attachment (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Piping LLC et al v. Epic Specialty Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Refractory LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Specialty Companies, LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Specialty Towers LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Precision Services LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Specialty I&E LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Specialty Mechanical LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Specialty Welding, LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Andrea Shannon
Represented By: Marc Stephen Whitfield
Represented By: Christopher Weimer
Represented By: Lauren Rivera Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Piping LLC
Represented By: Richard Franklin Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Julie Moffett McCall
Represented By: Keith Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United WELD Holdings, LP
Represented By: Richard Franklin Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Julie Moffett McCall
Represented By: Keith Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?