Massey v. Dominguez et al

Plaintiff: Shermaine Massey
Defendant: Cayetano Dominguez, EAK Logistics, LLC, Geico Casualty Company and Sentry Select Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00313
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Enroll Layne R. Dufour as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Enroll Layne R. Dufour as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 ORDER)(Dufour, Layne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Shermaine Massey. (Dufour, Layne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAK Logistics, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance Company (Ponder, Charles)
July 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EAK Logistics, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance Company.(Ponder, Charles)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Geico Casualty Company.(Drummond, Doran)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (SGO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Justin A. Day regarding Layne R. Dufour who is Co-Counsel for party Shermaine Massey. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/17/2019) (NLT).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 682087. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1943368), filed by Sentry Select Insurance Company, EAK Logistics, LLC, Cayetano Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Citation directed to Sentry Select Insurance Company with service upon R. Kyle Ardoin, Secretary of State, Commercial Division, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Citation directed to GEICO Casualty Company with service upon R. Kyle Ardoin, Secretary of State, Commercial Division, #3 Attachment Concurrence in Removal - GEICO Casualty Company, #4 Attachment Certificate of Compliance, #5 Attachment List of Parties, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Ponder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Dominguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayetano Dominguez
Represented By: Charles Milton Ponder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAK Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Charles Milton Ponder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Doran LeDrew Drummond
Represented By: Stephen Dale Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Milton Ponder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shermaine Massey
Represented By: Justin Andrew Day
Represented By: Georgia Brogdon Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?