LiftForward, Inc. v. Abu Maria, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: LiftForward, Inc.
Defendant: Twins Food Mart, LLC, Anood, LLC, Abu Maria, Inc., Ali Abdulla, Shanfara, Inc. and Aden I, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00314
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LiftForward, Inc.. Twins Food Mart, LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Lockridge, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LiftForward, Inc.. Shanfara, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Lockridge, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LiftForward, Inc.. Anood, LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Lockridge, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LiftForward, Inc.. Aden I, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Lockridge, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LiftForward, Inc.. Abu Maria, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Lockridge, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Ali Abdulla, Abu Maria, Inc., Aden I, Inc., Anood, LLC, Shanfara, Inc., Twins Food Mart, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Submitted (Lockridge, James) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (Lockridge, James) (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Lockridge, James) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Lockridge, James) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Lockridge, James) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Lockridge, James) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/24/2019 to flatten doc) (LT).
June 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Court Use Only) (SGO)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte/Consent Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 is RESET for 8/8/2019 at 11:00 a.m. The Status Report deadline is extended to 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 31, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte/Consent Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION Ex Parte/Consent Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference by LiftForward, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Lockridge, James)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (SGO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LiftForward, Inc.. (Lockridge, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Note & Guarantees against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1943547.), filed by LiftForward, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Verification of Blendi Batusha, #3 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit 2 - Demand letter)(Lockridge, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LiftForward, Inc. v. Abu Maria, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twins Food Mart, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anood, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Maria, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Abdulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanfara, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aden I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LiftForward, Inc.
Represented By: James Eric Lockridge
Represented By: Katilyn M. Hollowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?