Populars, Jr. v. Trimac Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Herman Populars, Jr.
Defendant: Trimac Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00316
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (SGO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Trimac Transportation, Inc..(Trahan, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trimac Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Trimac Active, Inc. for Trimac Transportation, Inc... (Trahan, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd District Court, Ascension Parish, Louisiana, Case Number 124965. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1943696), filed by Trimac Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Verification, #4 Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trahan, Kevin) (Attachment 5 replaced with flattened document 5/17/2019 (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Populars, Jr. v. Trimac Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Populars, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Robinson
Represented By: Willie G Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Derek Edward Elsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimac Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Wade Trahan
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?