Ahders v. SEI Private Trust Company et al

Plaintiff: Robert C Ahders
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Arch Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00353
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 79 Case transferred in from the Texas Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Adoption of Plaintiffs' Request for Designation of Contents of Record for Remand to USDC MDLA re: #77 Notice (Other) filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Designation of Record filed by Robert C Ahders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #76 Conditional Remand Order. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 76 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the action(s) on this conditional remand order be remanded to its/their respective transferor court(s). It is further ordered that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a) of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the parties shall furnish the Clerk for the Northern District of Texas with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Clerk's note: To docket the stipulation, please use the Stipulation/Designation of Record for MDL Case Remand event. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SUGGESTION OF REMAND TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA: The Court respectfully recommends the Panel that the Lille and Adhers cases be remanded to the transferor court. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/17/2019) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Elizabeth Hoop Fay is withdrawn as counsel for SEI Private Trust Company and SEI Investments Company. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/28/2018) (ewd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 73 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #72 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth Hoop Fay (Fay, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth Hoop Fay filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fay, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS: The final hearing on the Motion is set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/23/2018. (ewd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #68 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason H. Wilson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/14/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #67 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan P. McCarthy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/14/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 68 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9450264) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Jason H Wilson added to party SEI Investments Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jason H Wilson added to party SEI Private Trust Company(pty:dft) (Wilson, Jason) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 67 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ryan McCarthy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9450219) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Deposition of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company filed by Robert C Ahders (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Substitute Attorney Danny S. Ashby, of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP in place of T. Gregory Jackson. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/17/2018) (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of PLAINTIFF ROBERT AHDERS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO SEI PRIVATE TRUST COMPANY AND SEI INVESTMENTS COMPANY filed by Robert C Ahders (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Response to the Court's Instructions from July 27, 2018 Status Conference filed by Robert C Ahders (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Defendants' Letter to Honorable David Godbey re: #61 Supplemental Document filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company (Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 61 Supplemental Document by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company Letter from Attorney Gordon Cooney, Jr. per Judge Godbey. (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Danny S Ashby,Danny S Ashby for SEI Investments Company,Danny S Ashby for SEI Private Trust Company. Motion filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company Attorney Danny S Ashby added to party SEI Investments Company(pty:dft), Attorney Danny S Ashby added to party SEI Private Trust Company(pty:dft) (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 7/27/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Michael J Stanley; Defense should be J. Gordon Cooney Jr. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :18. (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 58 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 07/27/2018 before Judge David Godbey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawn McRoberts, Telephone number (214) 753-2349. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (22 pages) Redaction Request due 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. (smm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Regarding July 27, 2018 Status Conference filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit(s) Confidentiality and Protective Order) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/27/2018 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/12/2018) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - Hunton & Williams, LLP -- filed by Ralph S. Janvey et al. The final hearing is set for 11/28/17 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/7/2017. (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The Joint Expedited Motion filed by the Receiver, the Examiner and the Official Stanford Investors Committee seeking a status conference in 3:09-md-2099 at 70 is GRANTED. The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 11/28/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/7/2017) (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Final Approval Hearing will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas, at 10:00 a.m. on 11/28/17, which is a date at least ninety (90) calendar days after entry of this Scheduling Order. Any Person who wishes to object to the terms of the Settlement, the Bar Order, the Judgment and Bar Order, or Plaintiffs' request for approval of attorney's fees, or who wishes to appear at the Final Approval Hearing, must file a written objection in 3:09-CV-0298-N through ECF or by mailing the written objection to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 by 11/7/17. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stefan R. Dandelles. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/11/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8396343) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Stanley on behalf of Robert C Ahders. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER finding as moot #44 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs hereby withdraw and agree to the dismissal of any and all claims in the Complaint predicated on Sections 712(D) or 714(A) of the Louisiana Securities Law. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/31/2017) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 48 Agreed STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Hanover Insurance Group, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Beazley PLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Novae Group PLC for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 9, 2017 Filing 46 Appendix in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #45 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion The SEI Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 9, 2017 Filing 45 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #44 MOTION for Judgment The SEI Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 9, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Judgment The SEI Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James L. Pate. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/3/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Torian. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/3/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney James L. Pate (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8238409) filed by Continental Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 27, 2017 Filing 40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8238302) filed by Continental Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Balascio. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/24/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Judy Y. Barrasso. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/24/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana Kay Cochrane on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Cochrane, Diana) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Lavin, Parker) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael A. Balascio (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8222737) filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8222713) filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Hoop Fay. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd. for Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arch Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Insurance Company. (Arnold, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Hanover Insurance Group, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Beazley PLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Novae Group PLC for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Stefan Roane Dandelles added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London(pty:dft) (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefan Roane Dandelles on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Elizabeth Hoop Fay (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8210320) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Arch Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John W Arnold added to party Arch Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Arnold, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8210268) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Continental Casualty Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robert E Torian added to party Continental Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEI Private Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate SEI Investments Company for SEI Private Trust Company. (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEI Investments Company. (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney T Gregory Jackson added to party SEI Investments Company(pty:dft), Attorney T Gregory Jackson added to party SEI Private Trust Company(pty:dft) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Parker James Lavin added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lavin, Parker) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
February 14, 2017 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Nutmeg Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Seth A Schmeeckle added to party Nutmeg Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr (MDL-2099) (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 15 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Bryant). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:16-cv-00801. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. Electronic letter sent. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ELW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 12 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Minute Entry NEF) (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #10 fax received 12/20/2016, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 3/9/2017 at 3:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/23/2017.Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 22, 2016 Filing 10 Letter dated 12/20/2016 from Bevan W. Sabo to Judge Wilder-Doomes Re: JPMLTransfer (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 16, 2016 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/12/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/5/2016. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]
December 1, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1498722.), filed by Robert C Ahders. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahders v. SEI Private Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Stefan Roane Dandelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Michael A Balascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J Standish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert E. Torian
Represented By: James Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutmeg Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Investments Company
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoop Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Private Trust Company
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoop Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Ahders
Represented By: Bevan Wrynn Sabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?