Shihadeh v. Veeters et al
Plaintiff: Claire H Shihadeh
Defendant: Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc. and Philippe Veeters
Case Number: 3:2019cv00357
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claire H Shihadeh. Philippe Veeters served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Hickman, Sarah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned executed upon Dutch Physical Therapy on 06/10/2019 by Certified Mail (Hickman, Sarah) Modified on 7/25/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/14/2019. (SGO)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Philippe Veeters. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Claire H Shihadeh. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1951876),(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Veeters, #3 Summons - Dutch Physical Therapy)(Hickman, Sarah) Modified on 6/5/2019 to add payment information. (EDC). (Attachments 2 and 3 replaced on 6/5/2019 to flatten the document and add case number) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shihadeh v. Veeters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire H Shihadeh
Represented By: Sarah W Hickman
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippe Veeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?