Smith et al v. DG Louisiana, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dwayne Smith and Stephanie Smith
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC, DG Louisiana, LLC, Dollar General Store and XYZ Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00360
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Aguillard, Chad)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/14/2019. (SGO)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC. (Davies, Trevor)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of List of Parties and Pleadings by DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (McClelland, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for DG Louisiana, LLC, Dolgencorp LLC.. (McClelland, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Stephanie Smith and Dwayne Smith from 18th Judicial District Court, Case Number 45046. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1952910), filed by Dolgencorp LLC, DG Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(McClelland, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. DG Louisiana, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Smith
Represented By: Chad A. Aguillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Smith
Represented By: Chad A. Aguillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Represented By: Daniel Richard McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Represented By: Daniel Richard McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Store
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Daniel Richard McClelland
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Daniel Richard McClelland
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?