Engquist et al v. Adelia Development Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Engquist and Timothy J Basilica
Defendant: Michael John Hogstrum, Lacey Hogstrum and Adelia Development Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00373
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of the Waivers of Service filed and answers being due on 8/20/19 and 9/3/2019, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 is RESET to 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. An Amended Status Report is due by 9/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Timothy J Basilica. (Fiore, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ryan Engquist. Adelia Development Company, LLC waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Kleinpeter, R.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ryan Engquist. Michael John Hogstrum waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Kleinpeter, R.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ryan Engquist. Lacey Hogstrum waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Kleinpeter, R.)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (SGO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adelia Development Company, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lacey Hogstrum, Michael John Hogstrum. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons)(LT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Adelia Development Company, LLC, Lacey Hogstrum, Michael John Hogstrum ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1953924.), filed by Ryan Engquist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Summons, #2 Proposed Pleading; Summons, #3 Proposed Pleading; Summons)(Kleinpeter, R.) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/12/2019) (LT). (Additional attachment(s) and #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet added) to separate cover sheet from main document (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engquist et al v. Adelia Development Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael John Hogstrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Hogstrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelia Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Engquist
Represented By: R. Loren Kleinpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Basilica
Represented By: Erin Gourney Fonacier
Represented By: John B. Dunlap, III
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?