Banks v. Kottemann Law Firm
Plaintiff: Ericka Banks
Defendant: Kotteman Law Firm and Kottemann Law Firm
Case Number: 3:2019cv00375
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendant's answer having been due 7/22/2019, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 9/5/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report is now due by 8/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ericka Banks. Kottemann Law Firm served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Yitzchak Zelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 17, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Yitzchak Zelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1956893). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Yitzchak Zelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1956893) by Ericka Banks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Oath, #3 Exhibit Certificate of good Standing, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Raburn, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/11/2019. (KAH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kottemann Law Firm. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1954119.), filed by Ericka Banks. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Summons)(Raburn, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Kottemann Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kotteman Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kottemann Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Banks
Represented By: Jonathan Raburn
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?