Johnson v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Nathalie Johnson
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00377
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Velocity Investments, LLC.(Daly, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Velocity Investments, LLC by Nathalie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of the Order R. Doc. 6, Scheduling Conference is reset for 9/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Velocity Investments, LLC responsive pleading due 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/19/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathalie Johnson. Velocity Investments, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Receipt Confirmation)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
July 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Velocity Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Daly, David) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 07/01/2019. (ELW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Velocity Investments, LLC, filed by Nathalie Johnson (Filing Fee $400, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1954597). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Civil Summons)(Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified on 6/13/2019 to add payment information (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Elliot M. Lonker
Represented By: David S. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathalie Johnson
Represented By: Niko Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?