Carpenter Hospice of Northwest Louisiana, LLC et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice, LLC, Stat Home Health of Southwest Louisiana, LLC, Stat Home Health Houston, LLC, NOLA SJH II, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Southern Mississippi, LLC, Stat Home Health, LLC, Care Plan Oversight, LLC D/B/A Sage Rehabilitation Hospital, Stat Home Health-North, LLC, Stat Home Health Florida Panhandle, LLC, Homedica of Louisiana, LLC, Stat Home Health of Northwest Louisiana, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of South Alabama, LLC, Grace Hospice of New Orleans, LLC, Carpenter Hospice of Northwest Louisiana, LLC, Stat-Home Health-West, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of West Mississippi, LLC, Bellator Healthcare Management, LLC, Sage LTAC, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice & Palliative Care of Monroe, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Southwest Louisiana, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Cenla, LLC, CHP Properties, LLC D/B/A Capitol House, Stat Home Health of Cenark, LLC, Stat Home Health of Southeast Louisiana, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Houston, LLC, Lakeshore Home Health Care, LLC, Stat Home Health Houston Bellaire, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Acadiana, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice & Palliative Care-Northshore, LLC, Companion Home Services, LLC and St. Joseph Hospice of Bayou Region, LLC
Defendant: SpecGx, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC, Actavis, LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. and Allergan Finance LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00385
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Return on Electronic Transfer from Northern District of Ohio. (SWE)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (LLH)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order)(LLH)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Minute Entry NEF) (LLH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/13/2019 to edit the parties and date) (KMW).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., SpecGx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1955687.), filed by Stat Home Health Houston Bellaire, LLC, Grace Hospice of New Orleans, LLC, Companion Home Services, LLC, Stat Home Health Florida Panhandle, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice, LLC, Carpenter Hospice of Northwest Louisiana, LLC, Stat Home Health of Northwest Louisiana, LLC, Stat Home Health of Cenark, LLC, Bellator Healthcare Management, LLC, Homedica of Louisiana, LLC, NOLA SJH II, LLC, Stat Home Health of Southeast Louisiana, LLC, Stat Home Health-North, LLC, Stat Home Health Houston, LLC, Sage LTAC, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Houston, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of West Mississippi, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of South Alabama, LLC, CHP Properties, LLC D/B/A Capitol House, Care Plan Oversight, LLC D/B/A Sage Rehabilitation Hospital, Stat Home Health, LLC, Lakeshore Home Health Care, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Acadiana, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Southern Mississippi, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Southwest Louisiana, LLC, Stat-Home Health-West, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice & Palliative Care-Northshore, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Bayou Region, LLC, Stat Home Health of Southwest Louisiana, LLC, St. Joseph Hospice of Cenla, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet - List of Plaintiffs, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet - List of Defendants, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet - Counsel for Plaintiff)(Alexis, Ralph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/13/2019 to flatten the document) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter Hospice of Northwest Louisiana, LLC et al v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health of Southwest Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health Houston, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOLA SJH II, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of Southern Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Care Plan Oversight, LLC D/B/A Sage Rehabilitation Hospital
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health-North, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health Florida Panhandle, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homedica of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health of Northwest Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of South Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Hospice of New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenter Hospice of Northwest Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat-Home Health-West, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of West Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellator Healthcare Management, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage LTAC, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice & Palliative Care of Monroe, LLC
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of Southwest Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of Cenla, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHP Properties, LLC D/B/A Capitol House
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health of Cenark, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health of Southeast Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of Houston, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeshore Home Health Care, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stat Home Health Houston Bellaire, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of Acadiana, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice & Palliative Care-Northshore, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Home Services, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Hospice of Bayou Region, LLC
Represented By: Ralph R. Alexis, III
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?