Kimball v. SKR Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Kimball
Defendant: CF Industries Holdings, Inc., SKR Construction, LLC, Joshua Falcon and CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00393
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and #4 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by SKR Construction, LLC.(Percy, Robert) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joshua Falcon, SKR Construction, LLC, CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC, filed by Brittany Kimball. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bullman, James)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 9:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (SGO)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CF Industries Holdings, Inc., Joshua Falcon, SKR Construction, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1957637.), filed by Brittany Kimball. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Bullman, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/18/2019 to flatten document) (LT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball v. SKR Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Kimball
Represented By: James R Bullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Industries Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKR Construction, LLC
Represented By: Anna Quintero Skias
Represented By: Robert Ryland Percy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?