Hsieh v. Apache Deepwater, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David Hsieh
Defendant: Nustar Pipeline Company, LLC, Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC, Apache Deepwaer, LLC, The Allan Company, El-Oil, Ltd., Montello, Inc., Boo-ker Oil & Gas Corp., BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Cypress Energy Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Klentos Production Corporation, SWEPI LP, Shell Offshore, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Murphy Exploration & Production Company, Riceland Petroleum Company, Badger Oil Corporation, Sunbelt Energy, Ltd., W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn., Schlumberger Ltd. Company, Petro-Chem Equipment Company, Inc., Key Exploration Company, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC, Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc., Texaco Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Pintail Minerals Corporation, ENSCO Offshore Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Flash Gas & Oil Southwest, Inc. and Apache Deepwater, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00408
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Brian A Jackson
3 Judge: Joseph Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Remand filed by Apache Deepwaer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(EDC)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk of Court shall file into the record docket entries 33-1 through 33-5. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/15/2019. (EDC)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [R. Doc. 32] filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 8/14/2019. (SWE)
August 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #36 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [R. Doc. 32]. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [R. Doc. 32] by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Arthur, Mary)
August 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #33 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limit. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 12, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #32 Response in Opposition to Motion. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (SWE)
August 9, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Remand with Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of His Motion for Remand Attached filed by ENSCO Offshore Company. (Crohan, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Page Limit by Apache Deepwater, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - Return-Boo-Ker, #3 Exhibit 2 - Return-Petro-Chem, #4 Exhibit 3 - SOS-Petro-Chem, #5 Exhibit 4 - BOEM White Paper, #6 Proposed Order)(Longman, Douglas) Modified on 8/12/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Remand filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Fred Kellermann, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Master Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents)(Arthur, Mary) Modified on 8/12/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Main Document 32 replaced on 8/14/2019 in accordance with RD 37) (SWE).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Charles S. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 08/09/2019. (NLT)
August 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #30 MOTION for Charles S. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1981748). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Charles S. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1981748) by David Hsieh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Chester-Schindler, Susannah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ConocoPhillips Company.(Shofstahl, Tyson)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Peter Andersen Moir for Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 8/1/2019. (KAH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Petition for Damages by Murphy Exploration & Production Company.(Delk, Kimberly) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW).
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by ENSCO Offshore Company.(Crohan, Richard) Modified on 7/23/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
July 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #25 MOTION to Enroll Peter A. Moir as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Enroll Peter A. Moir as Additional Attorney by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Arthur, Mary)
July 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 MOTION to Remand with Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of His Motion for Remand Attached. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Remand by David Hsieh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of His Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Chester-Schindler, Susannah) Modified on 7/22/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Supplemental Petition by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.(Arthur, Mary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 Answer to First Supplemental Petition with Jury Demand by Apache Deepwaer, LLC.(Schuette, William)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal filed by Apache Deepwaer, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 7/18/2019. (SWE)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Robert Michael Kallam,Brian Joseph Lindsey for Badger Oil Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 7/18/2019. (SWE)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT granting #9 Motion to Amend Motion to Substitute Notice of Removal. The corrected Notice of Removal attached to Apache's motion shall be substituted for the Notice of Removal filed on 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 7/18/2019. (SWE)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Ex Parte MOTION MOTION for P. Albert Bienvenu to Withdraw as Attorney filed by The Allan Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 7/18/2019. (SWE)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. ConocoPhillips Company answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson on 7/18/2019. (SWE)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(f), the undersigned Chief Judges of the United States District Courts for the Middle District of Louisiana and the Eastern District of Louisiana hereby concur in and authorize the temporary assignment of United States Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. of the Eastern District to perform the duties designated herein in the Middle District in connection with the captioned case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph Wilkinson for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Chief Judge Nanette Jolivette Brown on 7/1/2019. (NLT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint 1st Supplemental Petition by Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC, Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC.(Williams, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Supplemental Complaint by SWEPI LP, Shell Oil Company.(Jalenak, Jay)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Supplemental Complaint by Nustar Pipeline Company, LLC.(Jalenak, Jay)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Petition by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shofstahl, Tyson) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit the event (SWE).
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION , filed by Apache Deepwaer, LLC , MOTION for P. Albert Bienvenu to Withdraw as Attorney by The Allan Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed ORDER on Ex-Parte Motion)(Bienvenu, P.) Modified on 7/11/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.(Viator, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Apache Deepwaer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Proposed Judgment)(Schuette, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Enroll Robert M. Kallam and Brian J. Lindsey as Attorney by Badger Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Kallam, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW)
June 24, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Unassigned. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Attorney Tyson B. Shofstahl regarding Leslie M. Henry who is Co-Counsel for party ConocoPhillips Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Attorney Stephen D. Baker who is lead counsel for party Riceland Petroleum Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney David M. Bienvenu regarding Patrick R. Follette and Meredith E. Chehardy who are Co-Counsel for party Exxon Mobil Corporation and ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Vickie R. Thompson who is lead counsel for party Chevron U.S.A. and Texaco Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
June 22, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
June 22, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Apache Deepwaer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Schuette, William) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/18/2019 in accordance with RD 19) (SWE).
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 670885. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1960114), filed by Apache Deepwaer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Discovery, #4 Exhibit Consents, #5 Exhibit Part 1 Court Record, #6 Exhibit Part 2 Court Record, #7 Exhibit Part 3 Court Record, #8 Exhibit Part 4 Court Record, #9 Exhibit Part 5 Court Record, #10 Exhibit Part 6 Court Record, #11 Exhibit Part 7 Court Record, #12 Exhibit Supp. Petition)(Schuette, William) (Attachments 9 and 10 replaced on 6/24/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/18/2019 in accordance with RD 19) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hsieh v. Apache Deepwater, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nustar Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Robert E. Williams, IV
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Richard P. Sulzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Deepwaer, LLC
Represented By: Carmen M. Rodriguez
Represented By: William L. Schuette, Jr.
Represented By: Michele Whitesell Crosby
Represented By: Douglas C. Longman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Allan Company
Represented By: P. Albert Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El-Oil, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montello, Inc.
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier DeBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boo-ker Oil & Gas Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc.
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation North America Inc.
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Tyson B. Shofstahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Mary Arthur
Represented By: Peter Andersen Moir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klentos Production Corporation
Represented By: Daniel C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWEPI LP
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc.
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Company
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riceland Petroleum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Oil Corporation
Represented By: John F. Colowich
Represented By: Robert Michael Kallam
Represented By: Brian Joseph Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Energy, Ltd.
Represented By: Larry Charles Hebert
Represented By: James Michael Fussell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Ltd. Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro-Chem Equipment Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Exploration Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Gambino, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Conner Percy
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Daniel E. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: Robert E. Williams, IV
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Richard P. Sulzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Drilling, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Gambino, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Conner Percy
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Daniel E. Buras, Jr.
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Erin Brooke Rigsby
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Varisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pintail Minerals Corporation
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company
Represented By: Richard Blakeman Crohan
Represented By: Brett Patrick Fenasci
Represented By: Michael A. McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier DeBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flash Gas & Oil Southwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Deepwater, LLC
Represented By: Carmen M. Rodriguez
Represented By: Michele Whitesell Crosby
Represented By: Douglas C. Longman, Jr.
Represented By: William L. Schuette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hsieh
Represented By: Susannah B. Chester-Schindler
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?