Regions Bank et al v. BP America Production Company et al
Plaintiff: Regions Bank, Curtis K. Stafford, Talmadge D. Bickham, III and Renee Larue Bickham
Defendant: ORX Resources, LLC, Hilcorp Energy Company, BP America Production Company and Falcon V, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00409
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by BP America Production Company. (Troutman, John)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Waive Initial Disclosures. To the extent any court action is necessary, it is noted that the parties have waived the requirement to exchange initial disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/15/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 MOTION (Joint Stipulation to Waive Initial Disclosures). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION to Waive Initial Disclosures by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Troutman, John) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit text and to correct event type. (EDC).
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank. (Keating, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Matthew Patrick Keating is added as co-counsel for Plaintiffs Renee Larue Bickham, Talmadge D. Bickham, III, Regions Bank, and Curtis K. Stafford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/30/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Enroll Matthew P. Keating as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Enroll Matthew P. Keating as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Bruchhaus, David)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Vacating #15 Order on Motion for Partial Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/24/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Hilcorp Energy Company are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/23/2019. (EDC)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Partial Dismissal. All claims and demands of Plaintiffs asserted against Falcon V, LLC and ORX Resources, LLC in the above entitled and numbered matter be and are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, and reserving all rights the Plaintiffs may have against all other defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (ELW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Other Affiliate BP P.L.C. for BP America Production Company. (Troutman, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilcorp Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent Hilcorp Energy Company for Hilcorp Energy Company.. (Luder, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice as to all claims against Falcon V, LLC and ORX Resources, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Bruchhaus, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BP America Production Company.(Troutman, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 12(b)(6) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Hilcorp Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Luder, David) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit the docket text and un-terminate motion per chambers (SWE).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Unopposed MOTIONS to Substitute Notice of Removal. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 5-1 in place of R. Doc. 1. The Clerk's Office shall also substitute R. Docs. 5-2 through 5-6 in place of R. Docs. 1-2 through 1-6. The additional exhibit (R. Doc. 5-7) shall be added as an attachment to the entry filed at R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (SGO)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by BP America Production Company, Hilcorp Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Luder, David)
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 25, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by BP America Production Company, Hilcorp Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Revised Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exh. A (part 1), #3 Exhibit Exh. A (part 2), #4 Exhibit Exh. A (part 3), #5 Exhibit Exh. A (part 4), #6 Exhibit Exh. A (part 5), #7 Exhibit Exh. A (part 6))(Luder, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 There is no document #4. Entered in error by case administrator Modified on 6/25/2019 (LT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney David Bruchhuas who is lead counsel for party Regions Bank, Curtis K. Stanford, Renee L. Bickham, and Talmadge Bickham. Co-counsels Chad E. Mudd, Matthew P. Keating, and Wesley A. Romero are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/25/2019 to correct letter) (LT).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by BP America Production Company, Hilcorp Energy Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Luder, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge, Case Number C683218. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1960153), filed by Hilcorp Energy Company, BP America Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Luder, David) (Main Document 1 - 6 replaced on 6/25/2019 in accordance with RD 8) (SWE). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2019 in accordance with RD 8: #8 Affidavit Exhibit A - Part 6) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank et al v. BP America Production Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: M. Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: David Paul Bruchhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis K. Stafford
Represented By: M. Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: David Paul Bruchhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talmadge D. Bickham, III
Represented By: M. Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: David Paul Bruchhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Larue Bickham
Represented By: M. Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Keating
Represented By: David Paul Bruchhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORX Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Company
Represented By: David N Luder
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Patrick J. Lorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: David N Luder
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: John Seth Troutman
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Court Charles VanTassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon V, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?