Precciely v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Webb Precciely
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, National N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust, Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C., U.S. Bank Trust, N. A. and Trustee for LSF
Case Number: 3:2019cv00416
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Pamela Webb Precciely. (Ridge, Garth)
August 23, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Substitute Jacquelyn L. Duhon in place of Philip A. Dominique as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Jacquelyn L. Duhon in place of Philip A. Dominique as Attorney by Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gibson, James)
August 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jackson & McPherson, LLC filed by Pamela Webb Precciely. (Ridge, Garth)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Pamela Webb Precciely. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Ridge, Garth)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Philip A. Dominique is enrolled as additional counsel of record for defendant Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
August 12, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Enroll Philip A. Dominique as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Enroll Philip A. Dominique as Additional Attorney by Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gibson, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Gibson, James)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/10/2019. (SGO)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. The moving defendant shall answer or file any other appropriate response in this matter on or before July 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
July 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gibson, James)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, National N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust.(Simmons, Avery)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 683689-25. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1962415), filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, National N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Consent)(Simmons, Avery)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precciely v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Webb Precciely
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Avery Ann Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, National N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Avery Ann Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson & McPherson, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Huey Gibson
Represented By: Rader Edward Jackson, III
Represented By: Philip A. Dominique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N. A.
Represented By: Avery Ann Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee for LSF
Represented By: Avery Ann Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?