Chem Carriers, L.L.C. v. L. Energy International, LLC
Plaintiff: Chem Carriers, L.L.C.
Defendant: L. Energy International, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00436
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Chem Carriers, L.L.C.. (Pusateri, Salvador)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to L. Energy International, LLC by Chem Carriers, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Affidavit, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pusateri, Salvador)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to L. Energy International, LLC (SWE)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment as to L. Energy International, LLC by Chem Carriers, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Pusateri, Salvador) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/8/2019. (SGO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chem Carriers, L.L.C.. L. Energy International, LLC served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Pusateri, Salvador)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chem Carriers, L.L.C.. L. Energy International, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Pusateri, Salvador)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L. Energy International, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CHARTER against L. Energy International, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1965273.), filed by Chem Carriers, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons)(Pusateri, Salvador)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chem Carriers, L.L.C. v. L. Energy International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Energy International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chem Carriers, L.L.C.
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?