Ayo v. Louisiana Dept. of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Charles Ayo
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy, James LeBlanc and Louisiana Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2019cv00449
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Enlargement of Time and Leave of Court to File Corrected Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Enlargement of Time and Leave of Court to File Corrected Pleadings by Glenn Charles Ayo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter)(KMW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. (KAH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (EDC)
August 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Glenn Charles Ayo. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(EDC)
July 10, 2019 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS), MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION Demanding Trial by Jury. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request/Motion Demanding Trial by Jury by Glenn Charles Ayo. (EDC) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit text. (EDC).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James LeBlanc, Louisiana Dept. of Corrections, Darrel Vannoy, filed by Glenn Charles Ayo.(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayo v. Louisiana Dept. of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Charles Ayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?