Stewart v. Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Patricia Stewart
Defendant: Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00474
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of all Current Deadlines Due to Settlement in Principle for good cause. A Joint Notice of Settlement under Local Rule 16(c) is due no later than 9/26/2019. The Show Cause Hearing set for 9/18/2019 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 5, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of All Current Deadlines Due to Settlement in Principle. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of All Current Deadlines Due to Settlement in Principle by Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Bell, Katie)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Patricia Stewart shall appear, though counsel, at a show cause hearing on September 18, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes and show cause for her failure to comply with the Courts July 23, 2019 Order at R. Doc. 3 regarding the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332. In lieu of appearing for the hearing, Plaintiff shall comply with the Court's July 23, 2019 Order by no later than September 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding #3 Notice and Order Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.s Memorandum in Support of Amount in Controversy Requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Bell, Katie) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages by Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C..(Bell, Katie) Modified on 7/25/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 7/30/2019, Defendant Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met. On or before 8/13/2019, Plaintiff Patricia Stewart shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Defendant has established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332, or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2019. (KAH)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2019. (LLH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 683930. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1972927), filed by Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bell, Katie) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/19/2019) (EDC). Modified on 7/19/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Stewart
Represented By: Charles Brandon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Katie D. Bell
Represented By: Vance A. Gibbs
Represented By: Forrest Edgar Guedry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?