Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC et al v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC and Omni Industries, LLC
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Petitioner: Ozark Purchasing, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. and O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00475
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Purchasing, LLC, Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Certificate in Compliance With Local Rule 7(e), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Intervening Complaint)(Vondenstein, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Exhibit(s) to #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Omni Industries, LLC, Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 3)(Murrill, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Iowa MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by Omni Industries, LLC, Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Murrill, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Filing of Joint Status Report and to Stay Implementation of a Case Management Order in light of the pending #5 MOTION to Transfer or, Alternatively, to Stay or Dismiss Case. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 is CANCELED. No status report is due at this time. The court will review this matter in 120 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/3/2019. (BLR) Modified to edit the text on 9/3/2019 (BLR). Modified on 9/3/2019 (NLT).
August 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Filing of Joint Status Report and to Stay Implementation of a Case Management Order . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Filing of Joint Status Report and to Stay Implementation of a Case Management Order by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Siegel, Robert)
August 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Iowa : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aspen American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Aspen U.S. Holdings, Corporate Parent Aspen (UK) Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Highlands Holdings, Ltd. for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company.. (Taylor, Jameson)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer or, Alternatively, to Stay or Dimiss Case by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Pleading;)(Taylor, Jameson) Modified on 8/26/2019 to edit the docket text (KMW). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss on 8/26/2019 (KMW).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Smith, Savannah)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/22/2019. (LLH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Monetary Damages against Aspen Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1973234.), filed by Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC, Omni Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit B. First Amended Class Action Complaint)(Murrill, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/22/2019 to flatten the document) (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC et al v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Specialty Packaging, LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: John Michael Parker, Sr.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Savannah Walker Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Industries, LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: John Michael Parker, Sr.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Savannah Walker Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert I. Siegel
Represented By: Jameson M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ozark Purchasing, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?